Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Owners in Common Ownership Communities Bill of Rights
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a bill of rights for unit owners of a condominium, members of a cooperative housing corporation, and lot owners of a homeowners association.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1060 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/20/2022
Legislative Date
9/20/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Owners in Common Ownership Communities Bill of Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2023
Legislative Date
1/12/2023
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2023
Legislative Date
1/17/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2023
Legislative Date
1/17/2023
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/20/2022 9/20/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Residential Owners in Common Ownership Communities Bill of Rights
House 1/12/2023 1/12/2023 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2023 1/17/2023 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2023 1/17/2023 Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/27/2023 9:18 AM
Click to return on the top page