Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Sponsored by
Delegate Belcastro
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee; providing that a person has immunity from liability for certain actions related to the Committee; providing for the sharing of information with and confidentiality of information obtained by the Committee; exempting Committee meetings from the Open Meetings Act; and prohibiting certain persons from testifying in any proceeding about details of a Committee meeting.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0094
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0209 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
House 3/03/2022 2/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Referred Finance 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
(   5-1001 through 5-1009 )
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page