Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows - Out-of-State Dealers
Sponsored by
Delegate Hartman
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing out-of-state motor home or recreational trailer dealers that are licensed by the licensing authority of another state to display motor homes and recreational vehicles at vehicle shows in Worcester County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0060
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2023
Legislative Date
10/30/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {503729/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows - Out-of-State Dealers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-5)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2023 10/30/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Worcester County - Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows - Out-of-State Dealers
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {503729/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows - Out-of-State Dealers
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-5) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Referred Rules 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 4:32 PM
Click to return on the top page