Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2023
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation to implement all possible incremental near-term safety improvements as soon as practicable if a new approved pedestrian or bicycle safety construction or improvement project is projected to take more than 12 months to complete.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0016
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/19/2022
Legislative Date
9/19/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2023
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2023
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/19/2022 9/19/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2023
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Favorable with Amendments {933325/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2023
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Judicial Proceedings 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/24/2023 12:57 PM
Click to return on the top page