Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Teacher Development and Retention Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "institution of initial eligibility" to include community colleges as eligible institutions as part of the criteria for applicants for the Teacher Development and Retention Program; altering certain school years for participation in the Program; altering the evaluation requirements for the Program; and authorizing the Teacher Development and Retention Fund to be used for administrative expenses for the Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0377
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/09/2023
Legislative Date
10/09/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2024
Legislative Date
1/05/2024
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803722/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903525/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/09/2023 10/09/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/05/2024 1/05/2024 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Teacher Development and Retention Program - Definition
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {803722/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Teacher Development and Retention Program - Alterations
House 2/22/2024 2/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2024 2/15/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable with Amendments {903525/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Teacher Development and Retention Program - Alterations
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 2:23 PM
Click to return on the top page