Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Sponsored by
Delegates Ruth, Amprey, Belcastro, Ebersole, Hill, Ivey, R. Lewis, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Stewart, Terrasa, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that provisions of law prohibiting and penalizing disruptive and threatening behavior on the grounds of, in the classes of, or in the home of an employee of an institution of elementary, secondary, or higher education do not apply to students who commit offenses at the institution they attend, students on exclusionary discipline who commit offenses at the institution they attend, or students who commit offenses at another institution while attending a sporting event or other extracurricular program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0119
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0700 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/13/2021
Legislative Date
10/13/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-42)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/13/2021 10/13/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-42) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/28/2022 10:52 AM
Click to return on the top page