Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study School Bus Safety (Maryland School Bus Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Delegate Mangione
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study School Bus Safety; requiring the Workgroup to identify issues related to safety for and behavior of students and bus drivers on buses driven to or from a primary or secondary school in the State; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the governing body of each county and Baltimore City, each county board of education, including Baltimore City, the Governor, and the General Assembly by June 30, 2025.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1137 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/28/2023
Legislative Date
8/28/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2024
Legislative Date
1/05/2024
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2024
Legislative Date
1/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/28/2023 8/28/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
House 1/05/2024 1/05/2024 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 1/05/2024 1/05/2024 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Text - First - Workgroup to Study School Bus Safety (Maryland School Bus Safety Act of 2024)
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 4:23 PM
Click to return on the top page