Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Public Adjusters
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified provisions concerning the licensing and practice of public adjusters; adding and altering specified definitions relating to public adjusters; providing an exception to licensing for specified marketing activities; repealing the requirement that public adjuster license application forms include specified employment disclosures; repealing the requirement for specified experience before taking a specified written examination; applying the Act to all public adjuster licenses issued or renewed on or after January 1, 2018; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Public Adjusters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343399/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Public Adjusters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Public Adjusters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Insurance - Public Adjusters
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {343399/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Public Adjusters
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Referred Finance 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Public Adjusters
(   10-401 through 10-403, 10-405 through 10-407, 10-409, 10-409.1, 10-410, 10-411 through 10-416 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page