Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
Sponsored by
Delegates Kerr, Cox, W. Fisher, Johnson, Krimm, Lopez, Luedtke, Solomon, Stewart, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that teachers employed by the Maryland School for the Deaf are in the professional service in the State Personnel Management System.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0035
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0597 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed 47-0
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Finance 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed 47-0 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
(   8-3A-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page