Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a member of the administrative, educational, or support staff of any public, private, or parochial school, acting in an official capacity, is not civilly liable for personal injury or property damage resulting from intervention in a student altercation or other student disturbance if the staff member intervened in a reasonably prudent manner and the actions taken do not constitute grossly negligent, willful, wanton, or intentionally tortious conduct.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0137 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/11/2023
Legislative Date
9/11/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2024
Legislative Date
1/16/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/30/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/11/2023 9/11/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention
House 1/16/2024 1/16/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/30/2024 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 11:54 PM
Click to return on the top page