Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases
Sponsored by
Delegates Pippy, Simpson, Arikan, Conaway, Grammer, Kaufman, Phillips, Taylor, and Schmidt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain requirement under which a court is authorized to order that the testimony of a child victim be taken outside a courtroom and shown in the courtroom by closed circuit television in certain child abuse cases.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/05/2023
Legislative Date
10/05/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/05/2023 10/05/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Child Abuse Victim - Testimony Taken Outside the Courtroom
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {143521/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:48 PM
Click to return on the top page