Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the termination date applicable to the Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit to June 30, 2022; and extending the applicability of the credit to taxable years beginning before January 1, 2021.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {175161/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {813526/1 (Delegate Moon) Rejected
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-40)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {175161/1 Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Floor Amendment {813526/1 (Delegate Moon) Rejected 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-40) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Referred Rules 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Text - Chapter - Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
(   2000, 2005, 2010 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page