Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified licensees to obtain and maintain a specified unique identifier and transfer licensing information to the Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and Registry during the time period established by the Commissioner of Financial Regulation; requiring the Commissioner to notify specified licensees of a specified transfer period and provide instructions for the transfer of licensing information at least 30 days before the transfer period begins; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {863794/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - Revisions
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {863794/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - Revisions
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Rules 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text - Chapter - Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - Revisions
(   7-101, 7-301, 7-302, 7-302.1, 7-303 through 7-306, 7-307, 7-307.1 )
(   1-101, 11-201, 11-203.1, 11-203.2, 11-204, 11-206 through 11-209, 11-209.1, 11-210, 11-211, 11-401, 11-403, 11-404, 11-407 through 11-412, 11-412.1, 11-501, 11-506.1, 11-601, 12-101, 12-105, 12-107, 12-107.1, 12-108 through 12-110, 12-110.1, 12-111 through 12-113, 12-408, 12-901, 12-904, 12-906, 12-908 through 12-913, 12-915, 2-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page