Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/2/2023 2:11:26 PM
Thursday, February 2, 2023
Thursday, February 2, 2023
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: February 2, 2023 9:25 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
February 2, 2023 3:30 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0010
Sen Bailey

Department of Natural Resources – Documents – Digital or Electronic Issuance
SB0023
Sen Brooks

Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services - Journeyman License - Qualifications
SB0034
Sen Hester

Department of Agriculture - State Ombudsman for Value-Added Agriculture
SB0063
Sen Kramer

Public Institutions of Higher Education - Transcript Requests by Students With Unpaid Student Account Balances
SB0096
Sen Hester

Howard County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone and Position of Archery Hunter
SB0102
Sen Bailey

Natural Resources - Recreational Crabbing License - Exemption
SB0121
Sen Rosapepe

More Opportunities for Career–Focused Students Act of 2023

Change made: February 2, 2023 11:37 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0417
Sen Elfreth, et al

Environment – State Wetlands – Shoreline Restoration
ADDED: 11:37 AM
SB0447
Sen Carozza, et al

Anaerobic Digestion Workgroup
ADDED: 11:37 AM

Change made: February 2, 2023 11:37 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0339
Sen Kagan

Election Law – Recounts – Procedures
ADDED: 11:37 AM
SB0366
Sen Lam

General Assembly Vacancy - Political Party Central Committees - Procedures
ADDED: 11:37 AM
SB0379
Sen Kagan, et al

Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
ADDED: 11:37 AM

Change made: February 2, 2023 11:58 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
February 22, 2023 2:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0280
Sen Gile, et al

Child Care Providers - Registration and Licensing - Exemptions
SB0300
Sen McCray

Baltimore City Young Readers Program – Expansion and Alterations
SB0321
Sen Beidle

Public Schools - Length of School Year and Innovative School Scheduling Models - Revisions
SB0338
Sen Ferguson

Primary and Secondary Education - Extended School Year Innovation Grant
SB0341
Sen Feldman

Public Senior Higher Education Institutions – Reproductive Health Services Plans – Requirements
SB0343
Sen Zucker, et al

Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account Establishment - Procedures
SB0352
Sen King, et al

Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining
REMOVED: 11:58 AM
SB0353
Sen M. Washington

Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Alterations

Change made: February 2, 2023 11:53 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
March 1, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0271
Sen Ready

Education – Maryland Civic Engagement Program – Established
SB0302
Sen Mautz

Talbot County - Board of Education - Election of Officers
SB0316
Sen Brooks, et al

Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum
SB0388
Sens Lewis Young and Guzzone

Public Schools - Standardized Behavioral Health Questionnaire for Students - Development and Implementation
SB0389
Sens Lewis Young and Rosapepe

Public Schools - Dual Language Education - Teacher Certification, Program Implementation, and Study
SB0394
Sen Kramer

State Board of Education - Membership - School Principal
SB0402
Sen Hershey

Kent County - Board of Education - Student Member

House
Early Childhood Subcommittee
Change made: February 2, 2023 10:26 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2023 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0078
Del Palakovich Carr

Public Schools - Anaphylactic Food Allergies - Guidelines

Change made: February 2, 2023 10:29 AM - HEARING ADDED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Work Session
February 3, 2023 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0078

Environment Subcommittee
Change made: February 2, 2023 10:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Environment Subcommittee - Work Session
February 8, 2023 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Local Revenues Subcommittee
Change made: February 2, 2023 11:18 AM - HEARING ADDED
Local Revenues Subcommittee - Work Session
February 7, 2023 11:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0021
HB0043
HB0083
HB0057

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: February 2, 2023 9:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
February 9, 2023 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: February 2, 2023 11:26 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0547
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Family Prosperity Act of 2023
ADDED: 11:26 AM
HB0551
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Broadband Expansion Incentive Act of 2023
ADDED: 11:26 AM
HB0552
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Economic Development - Build Our Future Grant Pilot Program and Fund (Innovation Economy Infrastructure Act of 2023)
ADDED: 11:26 AM
HB0554
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Military Retirement Income (Keep Our Heroes Home Act)
ADDED: 11:26 AM

Other
Baltimore County
Change made: February 2, 2023 10:02 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Baltimore County - Other
February 3, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Local Bill Hearings: HB348, HB381
REMOVED: 10:02 AM
Local Bill Hearings: HB348,
ADDED: 10:02 AM

Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: February 2, 2023 10:16 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
February 9, 2023 2:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
Regular Board Meeting

Howard
Change made: February 2, 2023 11:07 AM - HEARING ADDED
Howard - Other
February 7, 2023 7:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Howard County Delegation Public Hearing on Statewide Bills

Prince George's
Change made: February 2, 2023 9:35 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Prince George's - Other
February 2, 2023 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Public Safety
Criminal Procedure
Police
The Law Enforcement Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
Gaming
Alcoholic Beverages
Courts

Click to return on the top page