Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement – Certification of LGBTQ Businesses
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain certification agency, by December 1, 2022 and annually thereafter, to compile and manage a certain list of certified LGBTQ businesses in the State to identify and encourage outreach to LGBTQ businesses and track the use of certified LGBTQ businesses on State procurement contracts; authorizing the certification agency, in compiling the list, to use certain existing lists; and requiring the certification agency to publish the list on its website.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/31/2021
Legislative Date
10/31/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Procurement – Certification of LGBTQ Businesses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Procurement – Certification of LGBTQ Businesses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-33)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/31/2021 10/31/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Procurement – Certification of LGBTQ Businesses
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Procurement – Certification of LGBTQ Businesses
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-33) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:10 PM
Click to return on the top page