Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain individuals who sign individual tax returns as preparers are not exempt from the requirement to register with the State Board of Individual Tax Preparers.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Referred Finance 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/27/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text - Chapter - State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - Exemptions
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page