Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Arikan, Cardin, Grammer, Kaufman, Phillips, Simpson, Toles, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a provision in a contract or agreement relating to the use of a recreational facility that purports to release the recreational facility from, or indemnify or hold harmless the recreational facility against, liability for bodily injury is void and unenforceable when the bodily injury is caused by or results from the negligence or other wrongful act of the recreational facility or its agents or employees; and providing that a certain unit of State or local government is not included in the term "recreational facility".
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0291
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2023
Legislative Date
2/22/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633526/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2023
Legislative Date
2/22/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
House 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/22/2023 2/22/2023 Favorable with Amendments {633526/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2023 2/22/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
House 2/24/2023 2/24/2023 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2023 2/24/2023 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/29/2023 10:30 AM
Click to return on the top page