Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the spouse of a person on trial for a crime may be compelled to testify as an adverse witness if the spouse and the person on trial married after the date on which the alleged crime for which the person is on trial occurred.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0064 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-2)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed 47-0
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
House 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-2) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed 47-0 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Text - Chapter - Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page