Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credits - Teachers PG 410-19
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on dwellings that are owned by certain eligible teachers; providing for the maximum amount of the credit; requiring the Prince George's County government to submit a certain report concerning the credit to certain persons on or before a certain date; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prince George's County - Property Tax Credits - Teachers PG 410-19
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Property Tax Credits - Teachers PG 410-19
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {783920/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George's County - Property Tax Credits - Teachers PG 410-19
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Property Tax Credits - Teachers PG 410-19
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Floor Amendment {783920/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page