Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/1/2021 8:59:39 AM
Monday, March 1, 2021
Monday, March 1, 2021
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: March 1, 2021 7:32 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0806
Sen Peters

Labor and Employment – Workplace Fraud Act – Rebuttable Presumption of the Employer–Employee Relationship
REMOVED: 7:32 AM

Other
No. 11 - Baltimore City
Change made: March 1, 2021 8:42 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
March 8, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

Change made: March 1, 2021 8:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
March 12, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

Click to return on the top page