Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a new officer of a humane society or animal control to receive at least 80 hours of training within the first 12 months of employment; requiring an officer of a humane society or animal control to complete at least 6 hours of continuing education every year; requiring the training and continuing education to include instruction on current laws applicable to officers; and authorizing the appropriate unit of a county or municipality to require training in addition to that which is specified in the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0159
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1537 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/05/2020
Legislative Date
10/05/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {880112/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {448074/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/05/2020 10/05/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {880112/1 Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {448074/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Text - Chapter - Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:34 PM
Click to return on the top page