Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Case Record - Educational, Vocational, and Job History
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Ali, Anderson, Dumais, Ebersole, Gibson, Lam, J. Lewis, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Proctor, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Division of Correction to conduct a certain educational, vocational, and job history interview for each inmate as soon as feasible after the individual is sentenced to the jurisdiction of the Division; and requiring the Division to include the results of a certain educational, vocational, and job history interview in certain inmate case records.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1137
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-20)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmate Case Record - Educational, Vocational, and Job History
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Inmate Case Record - Educational, Vocational, and Job History
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (113-20) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Rules 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Text - Chapter - Correctional Services - Inmate Case Record - Educational, Vocational, and Job History
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page