Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing, from in excess of $10,000 to in excess of $25,000, the threshold amount for certain transfers by a personal representative, trustee, or conservator as a custodian for the benefit of a minor to require authorization by a court.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0075
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2024
Legislative Date
1/16/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453926/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court
House 1/16/2024 1/16/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {453926/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page