Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses MC 17-17
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a holder of a Class 7 micro-brewery license to brew malt beverages in two locations using the same license under specified conditions; authorizing the license holder to obtain a Class 2 rectifying license for use at the locations; requiring the license holder to request in writing and obtain permission of the Comptroller to brew in specified locations; requiring the Comptroller to make a specified determination; prohibiting the license holder from serving or selling specified beverages at the second brewing location; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses MC 17-17
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963197/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses MC 17-17
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses MC 17-17
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses MC 17-17
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {963197/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses MC 17-17
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses MC 17-17
(   2-209, 25-102, 25-405, 4-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page