Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaufman, Allen, Arikan, Cullison, Ebersole, Foley, Grammer, Hill, Ivey, A. Johnson, J. Lewis, J. Long, McComas, Pasteur, Phillips, Rosenberg, Schmidt, Simmons, Simpson, Solomon, Stein, Taveras, Taylor, Toles, Turner, and Woods
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying certain qualifications and training necessary for an individual to be appointed or approved by a court as a custody evaluator; specifying that certain expert evidence is admissible in certain child custody and visitation proceedings under certain circumstances; and requiring a court, in any action in which child support, custody, or visitation is at issue to provide information to the parties regarding the role, availability, and cost of a custody evaluator.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0365
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0285 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2024
Legislative Date
1/23/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
House 1/23/2024 1/23/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing canceled
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:56 PM
Click to return on the top page