Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Cullison, Glenn, Haynes, Holmes, Ivey, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Shoemaker, and Stein
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that a certain dispute settlement mechanism does not apply to complaints or demands arising out of a cooperative housing member's failure to pay certain assessments owed to the cooperative housing corporation; repealing a requirement that the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation hold a hearing on a certain alleged violation under certain circumstances; requiring the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation to give certain notice of a member's right to request a hearing on a certain alleged violation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0724
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0680 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {600612/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {600612/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-6B-30, 5-6B-31 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page