Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Voter Registration Drive – High Schools
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Barve, Boyce, Chang, Ivey, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Reznik, Shetty, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each local board of elections to conduct a voter registration drive at least once each school year in each public high school in the county in a manner specified in an agreement between the local board and county board of education; requiring each public official responsible for the use of a public high school to make available to the local board of elections, without charge, the space that is needed in the building for the proper conduct of a voter registration drive; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0934
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Voter Registration - High Schools
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {985067/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law – Voter Registration Drive – High Schools
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-39)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Voter Registration - High Schools
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Favorable with Amendments {985067/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law – Voter Registration Drive – High Schools
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (100-39) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   3-102, 3-201, 3-204.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page