Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Secretary of Aging - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Kerr, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Landis, R. Lewis, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Zucker)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an individual appointed as the Secretary of Aging to have extensive experience and knowledge of laws, legislation, and regulations relating to aging, programs for aging individuals, including evidence-based and data-driven programs, and a demonstrated commitment to the missions of both the federal Older Americans Act and the Department of Aging.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0511
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 20, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - Secretary of Aging - Qualifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293926/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Human Services - Secretary of Aging - Qualifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Human Services - Secretary of Aging - Qualifications
House 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {293926/1 Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Human Services - Secretary of Aging - Qualifications
House 3/03/2022 2/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Referred Finance 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {293325/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Zucker) Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page