Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Ali, Anderson, Clippinger, Conaway, Gibson, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, R. Lewis, Lierman, McIntosh, Mosby, Rosenberg, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Police Commissioner of Baltimore City, following each decennial census of the United States, to prepare a plan for the adjustment of the geographic boundaries and composition of each Baltimore City police district and the reallocation of the resources and personnel of the Baltimore City Police Department among the districts using certain information; requiring the Commissioner to present the plan to the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City within 1 year of the issuance of the decennial census data; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0009 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-4)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-4) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48CClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 67 Click to view Recorded Media
(   16-1, 16-55, 16-7 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page