Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegate McIntosh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a 2-year period of time during which a county government is not required to reimburse the State for outstanding debt service for specified school buildings that are transferred to a county government; and requiring a county government to reimburse the State for a specified amount of outstanding debt service for specified school buildings after the 2-year period of time has elapsed.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0460
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Text - Chapter - Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period
(   5-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page