Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - 41st Legislative District - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
Sponsored by
Delegates Attar, Rosenberg, and Bridges
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a marketplace license in a certain geographic area in the 41st legislative district in Baltimore City; and authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue the license.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0445
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Baltimore City - 41st Legislative District - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - 41st Legislative District - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - 41st Legislative District - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page