Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Advance Lithium-Ion Battery Safety in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Love and Boyce
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Advance Lithium-Ion Battery Safety in Maryland to study and make legislative, regulatory, programmatic, or other recommendations regarding certain best practices, standards, and guidelines; requiring the Commission to submit an interim progress report to the Legislative Policy Committee by December 1, 2024, and a final report of its findings and recommendations by December 1, 2025, to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0532
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission to Advance Lithium-Ion Battery Safety in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {123525/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commission to Advance Lithium-Ion Battery Safety in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-4)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Commission to Advance Lithium-Ion Battery Safety in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Commission to Advance Lithium-Ion Battery Safety in Maryland
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Favorable with Amendments {123525/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commission to Advance Lithium-Ion Battery Safety in Maryland
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-4) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {633820/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Commission to Advance Lithium-Ion Battery Safety in Maryland
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 10:13 AM
Click to return on the top page