Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Leases - Definition of "Rent"
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Boyce, Bridges, Charkoudian, Moon, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "rent" to mean, for premises subject to a residential lease, the fixed periodic sum for use and possession of the leased premises and does not include any additional payments due from the tenant to the landlord under the lease; and providing that the provisions of any local law enacted by the General Assembly that are of comparable subject matter to the Act shall yield to the Act to avoid inconsistency or conflict.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0941
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1346 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Leases - Definition of "Rent"
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Residential Leases - Definition of "Rent"
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page