Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Solomon
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain county boards of education seeking State funds for the construction of a new school, or the renovation of or an addition to an existing school that would increase the capacity by more than 100 students, to submit a pedestrian safety plan to the Interagency Commission on School Construction under certain circumstances; requiring the Commission to review the plans in consultation with the State Highway Administration; providing for the contents of the plan to ensure safe routes for students to walk or bike to school; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0615 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2021
Legislative Date
1/17/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-25)
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act)
House 1/17/2021 1/17/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act)
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (106-25) 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
(   5-324 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:38 PM
Click to return on the top page