Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Method and Amortization of Unfunded Liabilities or Surpluses
Sponsored by
Delegate Griffith (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amortization periods to be used for unfunded liabilities or surpluses of the State Retirement and Pension System; clarifying the application of a specified amortization period to specified changes; and phasing out a specified method for determining employer contribution rates for the employees' and teachers' retirement and pension systems.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0474
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted (47-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 32
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 31
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Favorable 47
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted (47-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Returned Passed 50A
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page