Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Access to Counsel in Evictions Program - Mandated Reports
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the information relating to the Access to Counsel in Evictions Program required to be reported by the Maryland Legal Services Corporation each year to include disaggregation by case type, the amount paid to attorneys for each case managed, the geographic distribution of cases, the disposition of cases decided, the amount of State and federal funds allocated to each designated organization, and the number of individuals provided legal representation for multiple cases.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0147
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2024
Legislative Date
1/30/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {323126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Real Property - Access to Counsel in Evictions Program - Mandated Reports
House 1/30/2024 1/30/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {323126/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Access to Counsel in Evictions Program - Mandated Reports
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page