Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Adams, Arentz, Jacobs, and Mautz
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Agriculture to conduct a study to assess the adverse financial impact of the invasive weed Palmer amaranth on the agricultural industry in the State and to determine the necessary actions each stakeholder must take to reduce the impact and the cost of each action; and requiring the Department to consult with certain representatives in conducting the study and to submit its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2018.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Noxious Weeds - Palmer Amaranth
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {790714/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – Study
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture - Noxious Weeds - Palmer Amaranth
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {790714/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – Study
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Text - Chapter - Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – Study
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page