Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Ghrist, and Jacobs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a pedestrian from catching or attempting to catch fish by any means on or under the Maryland Route 18 Kent Island Drawbridge over the Kent Narrows in Queen Anne's County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0981
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1117 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Text - Chapter - Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page