Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Property Tax Abatement MC 20-21
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 367
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Montgomery County to authorize, by law, for taxable years beginning on or after July 1, 2018, and under certain circumstances, an abatement of any overdue property tax on dwelling houses owned by disabled active duty service members, disabled veterans, or surviving spouses who qualify for a certain property tax exemption; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 367
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Montgomery County - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Property Tax Abatement MC 20-21
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Property Tax Abatement MC 20-21
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 367
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Property Tax Abatement MC 20-21
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:21 AM
Click to return on the top page