Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 9/20/2021 11:36:19 PM
Monday, September 20, 2021
Monday, September 20, 2021
Other
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Change made: September 20, 2021 10:05 AM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families - Other
October 6, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefings on long-term care issues affecting families.

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Change made: September 20, 2021 9:13 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
October 12, 2021 6:00 PM to October 12, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 20, 2021 9:21 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
October 18, 2021 6:00 PM to October 18, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 20, 2021 9:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
October 28, 2021 6:00 PM to October 28, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 20, 2021 9:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
November 3, 2021 6:00 PM to November 3, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 20, 2021 10:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
November 5, 2021 6:00 PM to November 5, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 20, 2021 10:49 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
November 10, 2021 6:00 PM to November 10, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 20, 2021 10:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
November 11, 2021 3:00 PM to November 11, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 20, 2021 11:24 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
November 18, 2021 6:00 PM to November 18, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

OIS Testing
Change made: September 20, 2021 11:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
OIS Testing - Other
September 20, 2021 6:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: September 20, 2021 1:17 PM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
October 14, 2021 9:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Change made: September 20, 2021 11:16 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Sports Wagering Application Review Commission - Other
September 21, 2021 3:00 PM to September 21, 2021 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
(Previous Location: Virtual Meeting)
Briefing on Legal Standards for Race-conscious Government Programs.

Click to return on the top page