Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Financial Protection Product Agreements Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing requirements applicable to motor vehicle financial protection product agreements, including requirements related to the circumstances under which motor vehicle financial protection product agreements can be canceled and disclosed; authorizing creditors to insure obligations under debt waiver agreements; establishing requirements for insurance policies providing coverage for obligations under debt waiver agreements; authorizing certain penalties for violation of the Act; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0573
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Financial Protection Product Agreements Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Financial Protection Product Agreements Act
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   33-101 through 33-401 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page