Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing – Sunset Extension, Licensure Exceptions, and Board Operations and Membership
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Pena-Melnyk, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Cullison, Guzzone, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, M. Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, and Woods
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Nursing in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2025, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; altering the exceptions to the registered nursing and licensed practical nurse licensure requirements; providing that, for a certain period of time, the Secretary of Health, rather than the Board, has authority over the infrastructure operations of the Board; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0960
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/03/2023
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/03/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2023
Legislative Date
2/07/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2023
Legislative Date
2/07/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2023
Legislative Date
2/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {133628/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2023
Legislative Date
2/16/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2023
Legislative Date
2/17/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2023
Legislative Date
3/29/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2023 2/03/2023 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/03/2023 2/03/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Nursing – Sunset Extension, Licensure Exceptions, and Board Operations and Membership
House 2/07/2023 2/07/2023 Hearing canceled
House 2/07/2023 2/07/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2023 2/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Favorable with Amendments {133628/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Nursing – Sunset Extension, Licensure Exceptions, and Board Operations and Membership
House 2/16/2023 2/16/2023 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2023 2/17/2023 Referred Finance 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2023 3/29/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2023 3/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments {593622/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2023 3/20/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/30/2023 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page