Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Compensation for Dealer Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein and Lisanti
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-2)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a vehicle manufacturer from recovering by certain means all or a portion of its costs for compensating a vehicle dealer for vehicle preparation and delivery or warranty or recall repairs by arbitrarily reducing the amount of the compensation that is due to the dealer, or imposing a separate charge, surcharge, or other burden; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-19)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {318570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Compensation for Dealer Services
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Compensation for Dealer Services
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (115-19) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {318570/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
(   15-202, 15-212 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page