Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Licensed Home Improvement Contractors - Liability Insurance
Sponsored by
Delegates Wims, Holmes, Kaufman, and Simmons
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $50,000 to $500,000 the amount of general liability insurance that an applicant for a home improvement contractor license or a licensed home improvement contractor must maintain.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0806
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-25)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation - Licensed Home Improvement Contractors - Liability Insurance
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Licensed Home Improvement Contractors - Liability Insurance
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (116-25) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 7:53 AM
Click to return on the top page