Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Bagnall, Bartlett, Barve, Belcastro, Boyce, Bridges, Brooks, Chang, Charles, Cullison, W. Fisher, Foley, Forbes, Guyton, Henson, R. Jones, Kaiser, Kerr, Korman, J. Lewis, Love, Patterson, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Ruth, Smith, Solomon, Stein, Valentino-Smith, Williams, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund to be used only for pediatric cancer research, prevention, and treatment; requiring the Secretary of Health to adopt regulations to implement a pediatric cancer research grant program; requiring the Governor in fiscal year 2023 to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $5,000,000 for the Fund; providing that if the $5,000,000 is not included in the fiscal year 2023 appropriation, then the Governor is required to include it in the fiscal year 2024 budget bill; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment and Income Tax Checkoff
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment and Income Tax Checkoff
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663821/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment and Income Tax Checkoff
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment and Income Tax Checkoff
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments {663821/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text - Chapter - Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment
(   20-120, 20-121 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page