Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Thresholds for Tasting Ho. Co. 19-17
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing specified thresholds for the amount of alcoholic beverages that a holder of a beer and wine tasting license in Howard County may serve for on-premises consumption; and increasing specified thresholds for the amount of alcoholic beverages that a holder of a beer, wine, and liquor tasting license in Howard County may serve for on-premises consumption.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Thresholds for Tasting Ho. Co. 19-17
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Thresholds for Tasting Ho. Co. 19-17
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Thresholds for Tasting Ho. Co. 19-17
(   23-102, 23-1307, 23-1308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page