Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the distance restrictions applicable to a licensed cannabis dispensary; prohibiting a political subdivision from establishing certain zoning requirements for licensed cannabis dispensaries and certain licensed cannabis growers that are more restrictive than any zoning requirements that existed on June 30, 2023, governing certain hemp farms; authorizing at least 10 individuals who are residents, commercial tenants, or real estate owners located within 1,000 feet of a licensed premise to file a protest against a license renewal; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0537
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423329/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {723726/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (39-97)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {123029/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (38-100)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {573924/1 (Delegate Miller) Withdrawn
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-35)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723721/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {863523/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (35-12)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-33)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {423329/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Miller) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Floor Amendment {723726/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (39-97) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Floor Amendment {123029/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (38-100) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Floor Amendment {573924/1 (Delegate Miller) Withdrawn 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (100-35) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Finance 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments {723721/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Beidle) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Floor Amendment {863523/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (35-12) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (97-33) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:49 AM
Click to return on the top page