Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning is the designated State Apprenticeship Agency under specified provisions of federal law; altering the duties of the Apprenticeship and Training Council; authorizing the Division to deregister a program or course rather than the Council suspending or revoking the approval of a program or course under specified circumstances; repealing a provision that authorizes the Council to recommend that the Division negotiate and adopt specified reciprocity agreements; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713897/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {967775/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {713897/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Rules 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/28/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {967775/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Text - Chapter - Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions
(   11-103, 11-403, 11-405, 11-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page