Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Rapid-Fire Activator - Switch/Auto-Sear
Sponsored by
The Speaker
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the term "rapid fire trigger activator" to be "rapid fire activator"; adding "switch/auto-sear" to the definition of "rapid fire activator" for purposes of certain prohibitions on rapid fire activators; and prohibiting a person from transporting a rapid fire activator into the State or manufacturing, possessing, selling, offering for sale, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a rapid fire activator with a certain exception.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Weapon Crimes - Switch/Auto-Sear
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Rapid-Fire Activator - Switch/Auto-Sear
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-36)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853128/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-11)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-37)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Rapid-Fire Activator - Switch/Auto-Sear
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Weapon Crimes - Switch/Auto-Sear
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments {203022/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Rapid-Fire Activator - Switch/Auto-Sear
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (101-36) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable with Amendments {853128/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (32-11) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (98-37) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Rapid-Fire Activator - Switch/Auto-Sear
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page