Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County – Board of Education – Data Disaggregation Policy and Racial Disparity Comparisons MC 24–22
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Montgomery County Board of Education to adopt a data disaggregation policy that applies to any data collection, reports, or internal documents and includes a category for each racial and ethnic group that constitutes at least 5% of the students enrolled in the Montgomery County public school system that is separate from any other category; and requiring the county board to include the impact on each racial and ethnic group that constitutes at least 5% of the enrolled students in any racial disparity comparisons done by the board.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {473420/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-4)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Montgomery County – Board of Education – Data Disaggregation Policy and Racial Disparity Comparisons MC 24–22
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {473420/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County – Board of Education – Data Disaggregation Policy and Racial Disparity Comparisons MC 24–22
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (128-4) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County – Board of Education – Data Disaggregation Policy and Racial Disparity Comparisons MC 24–22
(   4-141 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:26 PM
Click to return on the top page